User contributions
From 70 Brigade
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 14:01, 3 February 2021 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Pte Cooper with truck - probably Iceland.jpg (current)
- 14:00, 3 February 2021 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Pte Cooper with staff car - Iceland.jpg (current)
- 13:57, 3 February 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Photographs of men from the Battalion in Iceland 1940/1941
- 13:56, 3 February 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+700) . . N Photographs of men from the Battalion in Iceland 1940/1941 (Created page with "'''INTRODUCTION''' The batch of photographs set out below were kindly supplied by Claire Anderson - granddaughter of Private William Cooper, of the Battalion, who served as a...")
- 13:50, 3 February 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+64) . . 11th Battalion, The Durham Light Infantry War Diary 1941 (current)
- 13:48, 3 February 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+76) . . Cooper William Pte 4457099
- 13:47, 3 February 2021 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Pte William Cooper 11th DLI.jpg (current)
- 13:45, 3 February 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+927) . . N Cooper William Pte 4457099 (Created page with "{{personnel |Surname and forenames=Cooper William |Army number=4457099 |Rank=Private |Decorations=None known beyond Service Awards |Date of birth=Born 1/10/1918. |Age=(At time...")
- 13:46, 2 February 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+86) . . Wood Frank Richard Gunner 914128 (current)
- 13:42, 2 February 2021 (diff | hist) . . (-5) . . Wood Frank Richard Gunner 914128
- 13:41, 2 February 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+553) . . Wood Frank Richard Gunner 914128
- 13:39, 2 February 2021 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Oct 63.jpg (current)
- 13:35, 2 February 2021 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:20120209-00100002.jpg (current)
- 13:10, 2 February 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+1,289) . . N Wood Frank Richard Gunner 914128 (Created page with "{{personnel |Surname and forenames=Wood Frank Richard |Army number=914128 |Rank=Gunner |Decorations=None known beyond Service Awards |Date of birth=Born 11/7/1920. |Age=52 at...")
- 12:46, 2 February 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+42) . . 185th Field Regiment, Royal Artillery
- 12:45, 2 February 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+42) . . 143rd Field Regiment, Royal Artillery
- 17:07, 30 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+275) . . Cawton John Cheeseman Pte 4460983 (current)
- 13:07, 28 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+1,758) . . Leach William C. Pte 14499459 (current)
- 11:23, 28 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+1,605) . . N Leach William C. Pte 14499459 (Created page with "{{personnel |Surname and forenames=Leach William C. |Army number=14499459 |Rank=Private |Decorations=None known beyond Service Awards |Date of birth=Born Reigate, Surrey. |Age...")
- 11:04, 28 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+39) . . 10th Battalion, The Durham Light Infantry (10 DLI)
- 15:52, 22 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+31) . . 294th Field Company, Royal Engineers
- 13:27, 22 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+1,694) . . Laidler Frederick John L/Cpl Piper 4457026
- 17:11, 21 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+275) . . 55th (Suffolk Yeomanry) Anti-Tank Regiment, Royal Artillery, War Diary 1943 (current)
- 17:09, 21 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Gun exercise 1943 .jpg (current)
- 17:04, 21 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+527) . . Delahoy Anthony Gunner 1137005 (current)
- 17:02, 21 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Sgt Delahoy India 1945.jpg (current)
- 16:09, 21 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+145) . . Delahoy Anthony Gunner 1137005
- 16:05, 21 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+108) . . Delahoy Anthony Gunner 1137005
- 16:02, 21 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:2017 Image.jpg (current)
- 16:02, 21 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Anthony Delahoy 55th Anti-Tank Regiment.jpg (current)
- 15:49, 21 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+734) . . N Delahoy Anthony Gunner 1137005 (Created page with "{{personnel |Surname and forenames=Delahoy Anthony |Army number=1137005 |Rank=Gunner |Decorations=None known beyond Service Awards |Date of birth=Not yet ascertained. |Age= |U...")
- 15:43, 21 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+40) . . 55th Anti-Tank Regiment, Royal Artillery
- 16:27, 11 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+170) . . 49th West Riding Division (current)
- 16:23, 11 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+918) . . 49th West Riding Division
- 15:58, 11 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Kirkup Philip Brigadier 7992 (current)
- 12:57, 11 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+31) . . 1st Tyneside Scottish (1 TS)
- 12:50, 11 January 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+58) . . 2nd Battalion Princess Louise's Kensington Regiment
- 17:21, 3 December 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1,002) . . Hope Edward Parkin Gunner 918162 (current)
- 16:55, 3 December 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+695) . . Hood James William Martin Gunner 916818 (current)
- 16:34, 3 December 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1,464) . . N Hope Percy James Gunner 1479517 (Created page with "{{personnel |Surname and forenames=Hope Percy James |Army number=1479517 |Rank=Gunner |Decorations=None known beyond Service Awards |Date of birth=Not yet ascertained. |Age=(A...") (current)
- 16:15, 3 December 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1,469) . . N Hopkins Willis Arthur Gunner 3532673 (Created page with "{{personnel |Surname and forenames=Hopkins Willis Arthur |Army number=3532673 |Rank=Gunner |Decorations=None known beyond Service Awards |Date of birth=Not yet ascertained. |A...") (current)
- 16:06, 3 December 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . Hopkins Robert Gunner (current)
- 16:05, 3 December 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1,588) . . N Hopkins Robert Gunner (Created page with "{{personnel |Surname and forenames=Hopkins Robert |Army number=Not yet known. |Rank=Gunner |Decorations=None known beyond Service Awards |Date of birth=Not yet ascertained. |A...")
- 15:55, 3 December 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1,191) . . N Hooker Robert Edward Gunner 984067 (0/1944.) (current)
- 12:36, 3 December 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1,253) . . N Houghton Oswald Frank Gunner 1447024 (Created page with "{{personnel |Surname and forenames=Houghton Oswald Frank |Army number=1447024 |Rank=Gunner |Decorations=None known beyond Service Awards |Date of birth=Not yet ascertained. |A...") (current)
- 12:29, 3 December 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1,563) . . N Horne Thomas Richard Gunner 5117431 (Created page with "{{personnel |Surname and forenames=Horne Thomas Richard |Army number=5117431 |Rank=Gunner |Decorations=None known beyond Service Awards |Date of birth=Not yet ascertained. |Ag...") (current)
- 12:20, 3 December 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1,303) . . N Horne Leonard Owen Gunner (Created page with "{{personnel |Surname and forenames=Horne Leonard Owen |Army number=Not yet known. |Rank=Gunner |Decorations=None known beyond Service Awards |Date of birth=Not yet ascertained...") (current)
- 12:12, 3 December 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1,441) . . N Hopgood Arthur Samuel Gunner 1114053 (Created page with "{{personnel |Surname and forenames=Hopgood Arthur Samuel |Army number=1114053 |Rank=Gunner |Decorations=None known beyond Service Awards |Date of birth=Not yet ascertained. |A...") (current)
- 12:03, 3 December 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1,431) . . N Hooper William Thomas Gunner 836480 (Created page with "{{personnel |Surname and forenames=Hooper William Thomas |Army number=836480 |Rank=Gunner |Decorations=None known beyond Service Awards |Date of birth=Not yet ascertained. |Ag...") (current)
- 11:53, 3 December 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1,030) . . N Hooper Frederick Gunner 4919435 (Created page with "{{personnel |Surname and forenames=Hooper Frederick |Army number=4919435 |Rank=Gunner |Decorations=None known beyond Service Awards |Date of birth=Not yet ascertained. |Age=(A...") (current)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)