User contributions
From 70 Brigade
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 16:15, 8 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Bamforth Thomas Pte. 4456999
- 13:08, 8 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+348) . . Bamforth Thomas Pte. 4456999
- 12:36, 8 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1,239) . . Henderson Robert Sgt 4443317 (current)
- 15:19, 6 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+62) . . Thompson Arthur Gunner 910257 (current)
- 15:19, 6 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+62) . . McCready William Gunner 917072 (current)
- 15:18, 6 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+62) . . Robson William Brown Gunner 910836 (current)
- 11:53, 6 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+288) . . Grant Duncan MacPherson 2/Lt 138532 (current)
- 17:43, 5 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+344) . . Routledge William B Bombardier 913440 (current)
- 17:34, 5 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+541) . . McCready William Gunner 917072
- 13:37, 5 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+348) . . Timney Gordon A Lance Bombardier 913432 (current)
- 13:24, 5 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Timney Albert E Bombardier 912481 (current)
- 13:24, 5 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-5) . . Timney Albert E Bombardier 912481
- 13:24, 5 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+55) . . Timney Albert E Bombardier 912481
- 13:22, 5 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Albert Ermard Timney.jpg (current)
- 13:19, 5 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+396) . . Timney Albert E Bombardier 912481
- 13:00, 5 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+112) . . Thompson Arthur Gunner 910257
- 12:50, 5 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+667) . . N Thompson Arthur Gunner 910257 (Created page with "{{personnel |Surname and forenames=Thompson Arthur |Army number=910257 |Rank=Gunner |Decorations=None known so far. |Date of birth= |Unit=Enlisted in the Royal Artillery. Po...")
- 12:50, 5 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . 125th Field Regiment, Royal Artillery
- 12:46, 5 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+578) . . Robson William Brown Gunner 910836
- 09:26, 5 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+29) . . Fawcett Henry Nussey Noble Major 23790 (current)
- 09:21, 5 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+19) . . 70th Infantry Brigade
- 09:11, 5 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+8) . . Fawcett Henry Nussey Noble Major 23790
- 12:48, 4 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+3,074) . . N Fawcett Henry Nussey Noble Major 23790 (Created page with "Major Fawcett is mentioned in the 1st Tyneside Scottish War Diary on 27/4/1942 as being the Pack Transport Liaison Officer, based at Brigade HQ. It is now clear, having proce...")
- 12:48, 4 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+19) . . 25th Mule Company, Royal Indian Army Service Corps
- 11:21, 4 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Buzzard Thomas Arthur Pte 4459349 (current)
- 11:20, 4 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+234) . . Buzzard Thomas Arthur Pte 4459349
- 11:16, 4 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:1st Dorsets Group - Sgt Buzzard fifth from left in back row.jpg (current)
- 11:16, 4 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:1st Dorsets Group - Sgt Buzzard back row third from right.jpg (current)
- 11:15, 4 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Sgt Thomas Arthur Buzzard 1st Dorsets - third from left..jpg (current)
- 11:06, 4 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Buzzard Thomas Arthur Pte 4459349
- 11:06, 4 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+360) . . Buzzard Thomas Arthur Pte 4459349
- 17:48, 2 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+168) . . Gray David Alexander Major 38822 (current)
- 17:40, 2 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+102) . . Grant Duncan MacPherson 2/Lt 138532
- 17:26, 2 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+371) . . Grant Duncan MacPherson 2/Lt 138532
- 13:15, 2 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1,048) . . N Goldman Aaron Joseph Captain 254324 (Created page with "{{Personnel |Surname and forenames=Goldman Aaron Joseph |Army number=254324 |Rank=Captain. |Decorations=None known so far. |Date of birth=20/1/1916. |Age=0 |Unit=Commissioned...") (current)
- 13:15, 2 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . 11th Battalion, The Durham Light Infantry (11 DLI)
- 12:41, 2 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+202) . . Gilbey Quinton Holland Lt 120038 (current)
- 11:52, 2 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+141) . . Bibliography
- 13:16, 1 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+539) . . Gee Charles Hilton Rodney Major 24874 (current)
- 12:44, 1 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+517) . . France Bertram Cecil Lt 271488 (current)
- 12:15, 1 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-34) . . 11th Battalion, The Durham Light Infantry (11 DLI)
- 12:14, 1 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+272) . . Ford William Leslie Lt 251616 (current)
- 12:00, 1 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+182) . . Ford Wilfred Frank Lt 255812 (current)
- 11:24, 1 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+91) . . 11th Battalion, The Durham Light Infantry (11 DLI)
- 11:18, 1 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+95) . . Fitzpatrick Elmer J. Lt CDN 146 (current)
- 11:14, 1 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+32) . . Fitzpatrick Elmer J. Lt CDN 146
- 17:06, 26 October 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1,173) . . N Fanning-Evans Claude Captain 39613 (Created page with "{{Personnel |Surname and forenames=Fanning-Evans Claude |Army number=39613 |Rank=Captain |Decorations=None known so far. |Date of birth=Not yet ascertained. |Age=0 |Unit=Commi...") (current)
- 17:05, 26 October 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . 11th Battalion, The Durham Light Infantry (11 DLI)
- 16:33, 26 October 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+125) . . Ennis Joscelyn Reed 2/Lt 90765 (current)
- 16:28, 26 October 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+216) . . Ellison Robert Edward Captain 179846 (current)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)